Suttlar et al v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Springer Suttlar, Judy Green, Fred Love, Kwami Abdul-Bey, Clarice Abdul-Bey and Paula Withers
Defendant: John Thurston, Sharon Brooks, Bilenda Harris-Ritter, William Luther, Charles Roberts, Wendy Brandon, Jamie Clemmer and James Harmon Smith, III
Case Number: 4:2022cv00368
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motions for Remand and Stay by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Askew, Jess)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand; Response to Motion to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time; and giving the Defendants up to and including 6/3/2022, to respond to #9 Motion for Remand and #11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/20/2022. (ldb)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 plaintiffs' motion for extension of time; plaintiffs' deadline to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss shall be 14 days following the entry of this Court's ruling on plaintiffs' motion for remand #6 #9 #13 ; and granting #14 plaintiffs' motion for admission of counsel pro hac vice. Ms. Branch shall appear as counsel of record for plaintiffs along with Plaintiffs' Arkansas counsel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/12/2022. (kdr) Docket text modified on 5/12/2022 to correct typographical error. (kbc)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #13 Motion for Extension of Time does not contain a statement that the movant contacted the adverse party with regard to the motion (Local Rule 6.2(b)). (jak)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Aria Branch. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4263631. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2022: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2022)) (jak)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Askew, Jess)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of their Motion for Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Askew, Jess)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by All Plaintiffs (Askew, Jess)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/28/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/12/2022; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4D before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/02/2022. (tmw)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Jacobs, Dylan)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Jacobs, Dylan)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of All Defendants (Bronni, Nicholas)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by McKenzie L. Raub on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Taylor Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (jbh)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Paula Withers, Fred Love, Judy Green, Kwami Abdul-Bey, Deborah Springer Suttlar, Clarice Abdul-Bey. (jbh)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-01849. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT086467. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suttlar et al v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Springer Suttlar
Represented By: Aaron M. Mukerjee
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Joshua L. Harris
Represented By: Marilyn Gabriela Robb
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Represented By: Aria Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Green
Represented By: Aaron M. Mukerjee
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Joshua L. Harris
Represented By: Marilyn Gabriela Robb
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Represented By: Aria Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Love
Represented By: Aaron M. Mukerjee
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Joshua L. Harris
Represented By: Marilyn Gabriela Robb
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Represented By: Aria Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwami Abdul-Bey
Represented By: Aaron M. Mukerjee
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Joshua L. Harris
Represented By: Marilyn Gabriela Robb
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Represented By: Aria Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Abdul-Bey
Represented By: Aaron M. Mukerjee
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Joshua L. Harris
Represented By: Marilyn Gabriela Robb
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Represented By: Aria Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Withers
Represented By: Aaron M. Mukerjee
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Alexander Taylor Jones
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Joshua L. Harris
Represented By: Marilyn Gabriela Robb
Represented By: McKenzie L. Raub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Brooks
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilenda Harris-Ritter
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Luther
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Roberts
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Brandon
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Clemmer
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Harmon Smith, III
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?