Forest Place Apartments LLC v. Finley et al
Plaintiff: Forest Place Apartments LLC
Defendant: Frances Kay Finley and Does All Occupants of Apartment No. S309 Forest Place Apartments, 1421 North University Drive, Little Rock, AR 72207
Cross Defendant: Leeann Potter
Case Number: 4:2022cv00518
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. #18 , granted. Response due within ten days of the Court's Order on the pending motion to remand, Doc. #11 , and amended motion to remand, Doc. #17 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/2022. (slb)
August 1, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Forest Place Apartments LLC (Kitchens, Lloyd)
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Forest Place Apartments LLC (Kitchens, Lloyd)
July 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frances Kay Finley. (fjg)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Forest Place Apartments LLC filed by Frances Kay Finley. Related document: #5 Counterclaim filed by Frances Kay Finley.(fjg)
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Answer to Motion to Remand. CORRECTION: The original document was not attached to the docket entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The document was added to docket entry #13 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Frances Kay Finley. (jap)(Main Document added on 7/5/2022)(jak)
June 27, 2022 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Remand to State Court filed by Forest Place Apartments LLC. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Forest Place Apartments LLC (Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim by Forest Place Apartments LLC.(Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Forest Place Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Warranty Deed)(Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd W. Kitchens, III on behalf of Forest Place Apartments LLC (Kitchens, Lloyd)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Frances Kay Finley. (jap)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Frances Kay Finley. (ldb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 COUNTERCLAIM against Leeann Potter, filed by Frances Kay Finley. (ldb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Frances Kay Finley. (ldb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Forest Place Apartments LLC. (ldb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frances Kay Finley from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-1977. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frances Kay Finley. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forest Place Apartments LLC v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Place Apartments LLC
Represented By: David E. Simmons
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Kay Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does All Occupants of Apartment No. S309 Forest Place Apartments, 1421 North University Drive, Little Rock, AR 72207
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Leeann Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?