Turner v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Turner
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc and Microport Orthopedics Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv01014
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (jbh)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Turner v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia and assigned case number 1:21-cv-04476, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:22-cv-01014-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. Attached is a copy of Order Upon Transfer signed by Judge Baker. Electronic Notification signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/20/2022. (jbh)
October 20, 2022 Filing 44 Case electronically transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04476. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2022 Filing 43 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-20 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to the Eastern District of Arkansas for inclusion in MDL No. 2949. (ane) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
October 20, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (ane) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #41 Joint Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the motion to transfer currently before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 9/21/2022. (ane) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 20, 2022 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Transfer by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 13, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Anticipated Transfer by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Snedeker, Alice) Modified text on 9/14/2022 (ane). [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 39 Electronic Summons Issued as to Microport Orthopedics, Inc. (ane) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 38 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Osborne, Joseph) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 37 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Microport Orthopedics, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Heather Turner.(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the first amended complaint attached to Turner's motion. It shall become the operative complaint in this case. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 9/9/2022. (ane) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until and including September 30, 2022 to file their joint preliminary report and discovery plan. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 9/1/2022. (ane) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
August 31, 2022 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Parties to Complete Discovery Plan re: #28 Order by Heather Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Osborne, Joseph) Modified texton 9/1/2022 (ane). [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
August 25, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Heather Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Osborne, Joseph) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Parties to Complete Discovery Plan. The parties shall file their joint preliminary report and discovery plan by August 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 08/10/2022. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Parties to Complete Discovery Plan re: #30 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Heather Turner. (Osborne, Joseph) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING the parties' #29 Joint Motion for Extension of Time For Parties to Complete Discovery Plan until August 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 7/21/2022. (sap) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time For Parties to Complete Discovery Plan re: #28 Order, Set Submission Deadline by Heather Turner. (Osborne, Joseph) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing the parties to file their joint preliminary report and discovery plan within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 07/7/2022. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Snedeker, Alice) Modified on 5/27/2022 to edit text (lwb). [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 26 Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/24/2022.(Snedeker, Alice) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
May 25, 2022 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #25 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Wright Medical Group, Inc. ONLY pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (aaq) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Wright Medical Group, Inc. by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Snedeker, Alice) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/4/2022. (sap) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-4476-SEG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answers due 5/27/2022. The Court will grant no further extensions. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/28/22. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Answers due 3/28/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/8/22. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
January 21, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglass Alan Kreis. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/3/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
December 1, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglass Alan Kreis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11424255). Attorney Douglass A. Kreis added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (gas) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglass Alan Kreis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11424255).by Heather Turner. (Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Robert Bell, III. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answers due 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Anthony Osborne. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Robert Bell, III re #16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice E. Snedeker on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Snedeker, Alice) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 24, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Anthony Osborne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413195).. Attorney Joseph A. Osborne added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (nmb) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 24, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Bell, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413104).. Attorney J Robert Bell, III added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (nmb)[Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Anthony Osborne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413195).by Heather Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of James Robert Bell, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413104).by Heather Turner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Douglass A. Kreis. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to J Robert Bell, III. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph A. Osborne. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Wright Medical Group, Inc.)(jpa) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Heather Turner. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11358207) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 10/20/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Turner
Represented By: Charles Andrew Childers
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Represented By: James Robert Bell, III
Represented By: Joseph Osborne, Jr.
Represented By: Richard R. Schlueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Alice E. Snedeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microport Orthopedics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?