Leflar v. Best Buy Stores LP
Plaintiff: Sarah Leflar
Defendant: Best Buy Stores LP
Case Number: 4:2022cv01022
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michael A. Grill re #6 Order, 7 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment, 8 Text Entry Only Order, #9 Initial Scheduling Order, 10 Text Entry Only Order. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Melissa F. Gold re #6 Order, 7 Text Entry Only Notice of Reassignment, 8 Text Entry Only Order, #9 Initial Scheduling Order, 10 Text Entry Only Order. Resent to updated address. (fjg)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This case is STAYED until the Eighth Circuit issues a ruling in Robert Leflar v. Target Corporation, 4:22-cv-00727. After that case is resolved on appeal, the parties must file a motion to lift stay and Plaintiff may refile her motion. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/10/22. (dmm)
November 7, 2022 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/17/2023. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/30/2023. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2024 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 11/7/22. (mmb)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant's answer or responsive pleading must be filed 14 days after the Court issues a ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/07/22. (dmm)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #6 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (jak)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER originally filed in case 4:22-cv-00686 KGB directing the Clerk of Court to transfer immediately the case, and all cases listed on Courts Exhibit A attached hereto, to Judge Wilson. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/4/2022. (jak)
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Remand to State Court filed by Sarah Leflar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Slade, David)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sarah Leflar (Slade, David)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint in Light of Plaintiff's Forthcoming Motion for Remand by Best Buy Stores LP (Garner, Jerry)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Best Buy Stores LP, filed by Sarah Leflar.(kdr)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Best Buy Stores LP from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-22-379. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT088752. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leflar v. Best Buy Stores LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Leflar
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Represented By: David Slade
Represented By: Jerry Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores LP
Represented By: Jerry D. Garner
Represented By: John Carter Fairley
Represented By: Martin G. Durkin
Represented By: Melissa F. Gold
Represented By: Michael A. Grill
Represented By: Martin G. Durkin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?