Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc et al v. Thurston et al
Plaintiff: Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc, Conrad Reynolds and Donnie Scroggins
Defendant: John Thurston, Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners and Election Systems and Software LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00479
Filed: May 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2023 Filing 31 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #30 Motion to Expedite Brief in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lancaster, Clint)
July 11, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Expedited Consideration by All Plaintiffs (Lancaster, Clint)
June 20, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (McCarroll, Mary)
June 9, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc, Conrad Reynolds, Donnie Scroggins (Lancaster, Clint)
June 8, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE by Election Systems and Software LLC re #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Adoption (McCarroll, Mary)
June 8, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners, John Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark A. Robbins, #2 Exhibit ESS EVS6110 Test Report, #3 Exhibit ESS Certificate of Conformance)(Broyles, Jordan)
June 5, 2023 Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 Remand to State Court filed by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc, Conrad Reynolds, Donnie Scroggins. (Lancaster, Clint)
June 5, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc, Conrad Reynolds, Donnie Scroggins (Lancaster, Clint)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response ES&S response due by 6/8/2023. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/1/2023. (amr)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction by Election Systems and Software LLC (Crass, Kevin)
June 1, 2023 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Election Systems and Software LLC (McCarroll, Mary)
May 26, 2023 Filing 20 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #17 Notice of Appearance notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Separate Defendants will have up to and including June 8, 2023 to file their response to the pending motion for for injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/25/2023. (amr)
May 25, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #8 Brief in Support by Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners, John Thurston (Broyles, Jordan)
May 25, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathleen McCarroll on behalf of Election Systems and Software LLC (McCarroll, Mary)
May 25, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, by Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners, John Thurston.(Broyles, Jordan)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot 3 Motion for Permanent Injunction; finding as moot 3 Motion to Expedite in light of the pleadings docketed at ECF 7 and 8 and pursuant to Local Rule of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas 7.2(e). Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/25/2023. (amr)
May 25, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "COMPLAINT FOR A DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, MOTION FOR INJUNCTION, AND MOTION TO EXPEDITE with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc." as marked on the document. (jak)
May 24, 2023 Filing 14 SEPARATE DEFENDANT ELECTION SYSTEMS AND SOFTWARE, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH and INCORPORATED BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Election Systems and Software LLC. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #12 RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by All Plaintiffs. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by All Plaintiffs. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ARK. R. CIV. P. 10(d) re #6 Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #9 SEPARATE DEFENDANT ELECTION SYSTEMS AND SOFTWARE, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Election Systems and Software LLC. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 SEPARATE DEFENDANT ELECTION SYSTEMS AND SOFTWARE, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Election Systems and Software LLC. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #7 Motion for Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR A DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, VIOLATION OF THE ARKANSAS DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES ACT, AN ILLEGAL EXACTION, FRAUD, MOTION FOR INJUNCTION, AND MOTION TO EXPEDITE with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc, Conrad Reynolds, Donnie Scroggins. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #2 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT and 3 MOTION FOR INJUNCTION and MOTION TO EXPEDITE on Behalf of Separate Defendants Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners and John Thurston. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER TO #2 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT and 3 MOTION FOR INJUNCTION and MOTION TO EXPEDITE by Election Systems and Software LLC. (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Injunction and MOTION to Expedite by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc. (No separate document filed; see docket entry #2 . (llg)
May 24, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR A DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, MOTION FOR INJUNCTION, AND MOTION TO EXPEDITE with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc. (llg) (Docket text modified on 5/25/2023 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
May 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners and John Thurston from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-08658. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT2276. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc et al v. Thurston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Voter Integrity Initiative Inc
Represented By: Clint W. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Reynolds
Represented By: Clint W. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Scroggins
Represented By: Clint W. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Jordan Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State Board of Election Commissioners
Represented By: Jordan Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Election Systems and Software LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Mary Kathleen McCarroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?