Ward v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Valary K Ward
Defendant: Arkansas, State of, Yell County, Perry County, Missouri, State of, Grundy County, Tommy Land, US Department of the Interior, US Department of Agriculture and AgriBank FCB
Case Number: 4:2023cv00485
Filed: May 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Central Division Office
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2023 Summons Reissued as to US Department of the Interior and Returned to Party for service. (ajj)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tommy Land. (White, Brooks)
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () by Tommy Land (White, Brooks)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks Christopher White on behalf of Tommy Land (White, Brooks)
June 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to #7 based on the attached correspondence. (kbc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Separate Defendants' Alternative Answer to Complaint by Yell County.(Barham, Richard)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Brief in Support of Separate Defendant's (Yell County's, Anna Ward and Sherry Hicks') Motion to Dismiss filed by Yell County. (Barham, Richard)
June 20, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Separate Defendant's (Yell County's, Anna Ward and Sherry Hicks') Motion to Dismiss () by Yell County (Barham, Richard)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AgriBank FCB. (Coleman, Charles)
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AgriBank FCB (Coleman, Charles) Additional attachment added on 6/20/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Coleman on behalf of AgriBank FCB (Coleman, Charles)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/15/2023. (jak)
June 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #3 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
June 2, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark submitted by the Clerk's office to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on 6/2/2023. (cmn)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying without prejudice the embedded request for a preliminary injunction. There must be a separate motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/26/2023. (jak)
May 26, 2023 Summons Reissued as to US Department of the Interior and Returned to Party for service. (ajj)
May 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaration, Injunctive, and Punitive Relief against filed by Valary K Ward All Defendants. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT2288.) Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valary K Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yell County
Represented By: Richard Tyler Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grundy County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Land
Represented By: Brooks Christopher White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgriBank FCB
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?