Lisko et al v. Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc et al
Plaintiff: Andy Lisko, Amy Lisko, Matt Perry and Wendy Perry
Defendant: Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc, Crary Industries Inc, Bosch Rexroth Corporation, CNH Industrial America LLC, Case New Holland Industrial Inc and Does John and Jane 1-20
Case Number: 4:2023cv00757
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 25 JOINDER by Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc to #18 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Wilson, David)
October 5, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE by Crary Industries Inc re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Foster, Nicholas)
October 5, 2023 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Crary Industries Inc (Foster, Nicholas)
October 5, 2023 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Crary Industries Inc. (Foster, Nicholas)
October 5, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crary Industries Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Joe Zurn, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Shawn Zabel)(Foster, Nicholas)
October 5, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Foster on behalf of Crary Industries Inc (Foster, Nicholas)
September 29, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by Bosch Rexroth Corporation re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion (Heath, Haley)
September 29, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND filed by CNH Industrial America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Larkin, Glenn)
September 25, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits , filed by Andy Lisko. Crary Industries Inc served on 9/16/2023. (Kelly, Jerry)
September 18, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Bosch Rexroth Corporation. (Heath, Haley)
September 15, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Grooms, Kendel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs (Grooms, Kendel)
September 12, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Andy Lisko. Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc served on 9/6/2023. (Kelly, Jerry)
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by CNH Industrial America LLC, Case New Holland Industrial Inc.(Larkin, Glenn)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #4 Motion to Dismiss notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
September 6, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Grooms, Kendel)
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Grooms, Kendel)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc (Wilson, David)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc.(Wilson, David)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Wilson on behalf of Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc (Wilson, David)
August 28, 2023 Summons Issued as to Crary Industries Inc, Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bosch Rexroth Corporation. (Heath, Haley)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bosch Rexroth Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Heath, Haley)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by CNH Industrial America LLC. (llg)
August 16, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Andy Lisko, Amy Lisko, Matt Perry, and Wendy Perry. (llg)
August 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CNH Industrial America LLC and Case New Holland Industrial Inc from Prairie County Circuit Court, case number 59SCV-23-00043. Filing Fee of $402 paid, receipt number LIT3264. (Attachment #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisko et al v. Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Lisko
Represented By: Jerry Kelly
Represented By: Kendel W. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lisko
Represented By: Jerry Kelly
Represented By: Kendel W. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Perry
Represented By: Jerry Kelly
Represented By: Kendel W. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Perry
Represented By: Jerry Kelly
Represented By: Kendel W. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-South Agricultural Equipment Inc
Represented By: David D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crary Industries Inc
Represented By: Nicholas James Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Rexroth Corporation
Represented By: Haley M. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Glenn V. Larkin
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case New Holland Industrial Inc
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Represented By: Glenn V. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does John and Jane 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?