Public Private Partnership Corp et al v. Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc et al
Plaintiff: Public Private Partnership Corp doing business as P3 Group IV and Jefferson County Buildings LLC
Defendant: Commercial Construction & Maintenanace Inc, Paul Pence, Lacey Pence, Kevin Pence, Clayborne S Stone, Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC doing business as Mitchell Williams and Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc
Case Number: 4:2023cv00827
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Libel,Assualt,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jefferson County Buildings LLC, Public Private Partnership Corp. (Crabtree, Danny)
November 2, 2023 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/2/2023. (jbh)
October 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 and #12 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in editable image file formats. The correct document was added to docket entry #11 and #12 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
October 25, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Jefferson County Buildings LLC, Public Private Partnership Corp (Crabtree, Danny)
October 25, 2023 Filing 16 Deficiency Letter re #7 Motion to Remand notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
October 20, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC. (Castleberry, Kenneth)
October 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC (Castleberry, Kenneth)
October 20, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC (Castleberry, Kenneth)
October 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth P. Castleberry on behalf of Clayborne S Stone (Castleberry, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 10/25/2023)) (jak).
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth P. Castleberry on behalf of Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC (Castleberry, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 10/25/2023)) (jak).
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc, Kevin Pence, Lacey Pence, Paul Pence. (O'Hara, Laura)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of summons/complaint , filed by Jefferson County Buildings LLC, Public Private Partnership Corp. Clayborne S Stone served on 10/2/2023. (Crabtree, Danny)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of summons/complaint , filed by Jefferson County Buildings LLC, Public Private Partnership Corp. Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC served on 10/2/2023. (Crabtree, Danny)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jefferson County Buildings LLC, Public Private Partnership Corp (Crabtree, Danny)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Separate Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc, Kevin Pence, Lacey Pence, Paul Pence.(O'Hara, Laura)
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Lanier O'Hara on behalf of Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc, Kevin Pence, Lacey Pence, Paul Pence (O'Hara, Laura)
September 8, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal and #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as, "Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
September 7, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc. (ldb) (Docket text modified on 9/8/2023 to correct party name.)(cmn)
September 7, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jefferson County Buildings LLC, Public Private Partnership Corp against All Defendants. (ldb)
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc, Kevin Pence, Lacey Pence, Paul Pence from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 35CV-23-609. Fee $402, receipt number LIT3480. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb) (Docket text modified on 9/8/2023 to correct typographical error in party name.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public Private Partnership Corp et al v. Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Private Partnership Corp doing business as P3 Group IV
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County Buildings LLC
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Construction & Maintenanace Inc
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pence
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Laura Lanier O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Pence
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Laura Lanier O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Pence
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Laura Lanier O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayborne S Stone
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Williams Selig Gates & Woodyard PLLC doing business as Mitchell Williams
Represented By: Kenneth P. Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Construction & Maintenance Inc
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Laura Lanier O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?