Little Rock Arkansas, City of v. Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC et al
Plaintiff: Little Rock Arkansas, City of
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Holdings LLC, Marquette Transportation Company LLC, Marquette Transportation Holdings Inc, Marquette Transportation Company Offshore LLC and Marquette Transportation Finance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2023cv00831
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688 Maritime Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/9/2024. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/23/2024. Bench Trial set for 11/5/2024 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 11/1/23. (mmb)
November 1, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the attorney entering appearance as Thomas H. Wyatt on behalf of all defendants as marked on the document. (jak)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Holdings LLC, Marquette Transportation Company LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Offshore LLC, Marquette Transportation Finance Corporation, Marquette Transportation Holdings Inc.(Quattlebaum, Steven)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Wyatt on behalf of All Defendants (Quattlebaum, Steven)(Docket text modified on 11/1/2023 to correct the attorney entering appearance)(jak)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Quattlebaum on behalf of Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Holdings LLC, Marquette Transportation Company LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Offshore LLC, Marquette Transportation Finance Corporation, Marquette Transportation Holdings Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Marquette Transportation Company Holdings LLC served on 10/10/2023. (Carpenter, Thomas)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Marquette Transportation Company LLC served on 10/10/2023. (Carpenter, Thomas)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Marquette Transportation Company Offshore LLC served on 10/10/2023. (Carpenter, Thomas)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC served on 10/10/2023. (Carpenter, Thomas)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Marquette Transportation Holdings Inc served on 10/10/2023. (Carpenter, Thomas)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of. Marquette Transportation Finance Corporation served on 10/10/2023. (Carpenter, Thomas)
October 5, 2023 Summons Issued to All Defendants and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alan Wayne Jones terminated. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/28/23. (mmb)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Little Rock Arkansas, City of (Jones, Alan)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed R. Edwards on behalf of Little Rock Arkansas, City of (Edwards, Reed)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date to 9/7/2023 as indicated on the document. The Civil Cover Sheet was not submitted during docketing due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. It has been added to #1 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of against All Defendants. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT3485.) No summons issued. (ldb) Additional attachment added on 9/8/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. Docket entry modified on 9/8/2023 to correct file date. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Rock Arkansas, City of v. Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Rock Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Alan Wayne Jones
Represented By: Thomas M. Carpenter
Represented By: Reed R. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hartley Wyatt
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Holdings LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hartley Wyatt
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hartley Wyatt
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Holdings Inc
Represented By: Thomas Hartley Wyatt
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Offshore LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hartley Wyatt
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Finance Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Hartley Wyatt
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?