Warren et al v. Millennia Housing Management LTD et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Warren, Kiara Booker, Bernamesha Young, Miyana Bryant, Kelly O'Donald and Shanta Burnett
Defendant: Millennia Housing Management LTD, Millenia Commercial Group LTD, Millenia Housing Development LTD, Millenia Housing Capital LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC, Does John Does 1-10, Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD and John Does
Case Number: 4:2023cv00977
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time; and extending the time for plaintiffs to respond to #13 motion to dismiss to, and including, 12/15/2023. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/21/2023. (jbh)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Brief in Support, #13 MOTION to Dismiss and strike by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Confirming Agreement of Extension)(Graham, Chauncy)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 , #12 motions to admit Mr. Kavouras and Mr. Camardo pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/15/2023. (jbh)
November 10, 2023 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss and strike filed by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Wankum, Mark)
November 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and strike by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC (Wankum, Mark)
November 2, 2023 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge Kristine G. Baker. Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/2/2023. (jbh)
October 20, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Sam Camardo. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4622762. Filed by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC (Wankum, Mark)
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel M. Kavouras. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4622752. Filed by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC (Wankum, Mark)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Millennia Housing Management, Ltd., Millennia Commercial Group, Ltd., Millennia Housing Development, Ltd., Millennia Housing Capital, Ltd., and SC Apartments AR, LLC's unopposed motion for a 21-day extension of defendants' time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. The time for defendants to respond to plaintiffs' complaint is extended to, and includes, 11/10/2023. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/18/2023. (kdr)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wankum, Mark)
October 17, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certification, #5 , #6 , and #8 Corporate Disclosure Statements. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to correct the party filer names as Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, and Millennia Housing Management LTD as marked on the documents. (jak)
October 13, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Millennia Housing Capital LTD. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 10/17/2023 to correct the party filer name)(jak)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Millennia Housing Management LTD. (jbh)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Millennia Housing Development LTD. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 10/17/2023 to correct the party filer name) (jak)
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Millennia Commercial Group LTD. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 10/17/2023 to correct the party filer name)(jak)
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SC Apartments AR LLC. (jbh)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 10/17/2023 to correct the party filer names)(jak)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Shanta Burnett, Bernamesha Young, Kelly O'Donald, Jordan Warren, Miyana Bryant, Kiara Booker. (jbh)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Millennia Commercial Group LTD, Millennia Housing Capital LTD, Millennia Housing Development LTD, Millennia Housing Management LTD, SC Apartments AR LLC from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-23-06684. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT3917. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Docket text modified on 10/17/2023 to correct the party names)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren et al v. Millennia Housing Management LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Warren
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Chauncy Graham
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Graves
Represented By: Chauncy Jamarcus Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Booker
Represented By: Chauncy Graham
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Graves
Represented By: Chauncy Jamarcus Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernamesha Young
Represented By: Chauncy Graham
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Graves
Represented By: Chauncy Jamarcus Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miyana Bryant
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Graves
Represented By: Chauncy Graham
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Chauncy Jamarcus Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly O'Donald
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Graves
Represented By: Chauncy Graham
Represented By: Chauncy Jamarcus Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanta Burnett
Represented By: Chauncy Graham
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Graves
Represented By: Terris C. Harris
Represented By: Chauncy Jamarcus Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennia Housing Management LTD
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel K. Kavouras
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenia Commercial Group LTD
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel K. Kavouras
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenia Housing Development LTD
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel K. Kavouras
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenia Housing Capital LTD
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel K. Kavouras
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Apartments AR LLC
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel K. Kavouras
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennia Commercial Group LTD
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennia Housing Development LTD
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennia Housing Capital LTD
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?