Roe v. Hill
Plaintiff: Jackson Roe
Defendant: James French Hill
Case Number: 4:2023cv01056
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James French Hill. (Craigmyle, Bradley)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM () by James French Hill (Craigmyle, Bradley)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The civil cover sheet was not submitted with the original filing of the document. The civil cover sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Jackson Roe against James French Hill. (ldb)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James French Hill from Conway State District Court, case number CWSC-23-82. (ldb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted on 11/6/2023) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James French Hill
Represented By: Matthew B. Berry
Represented By: Bradley Craigmyle
Represented By: Todd Barry Tatelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?