Knight v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Danna Knight
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and USW Local 619
Case Number: 4:2024cv00039
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/5/2024. (slb)
February 1, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Donovan, David)
February 1, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Stipulation, Doc. #3 , noted. USW Local 619 is dismissed without prejudice as a defendant. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/24/2024. (slb)Notice: The terminated party will no longer receive filing notifications through CM/ECF. To continue receiving filing notifications, #email the Clerk of Court and request reinstatement. Please refer to the CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures for Civil Filings for information about when a terminated party must be served.
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal of USW Local 619 by Danna Knight. (Lacy, Brandon)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Donovan, David)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Danna Knight against All Defendants. Fee $405; Receipt No. LIT4993. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danna Knight
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USW Local 619
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?