Rauch v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: John Rauch, III
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2024cv00108
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Preston on behalf of Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah)
February 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Linerud on behalf of John Rauch, III (Linerud, Rory)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/8/2024. (lej)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by John Rauch, III against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(csf)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Rauch, III. (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rauch v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rauch, III
Represented By: Randolph M. Baltz
Represented By: Rory Linerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Shannon S. Smith
Represented By: Sarah Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?