Maxwell v. White Hall School District et al
Plaintiff: Henry Maxwell, Jr
Defendant: White Hall School District, Lyndzey Hegwood, Lindsey Phillips, Brent Bridges, Tammy Canada, Cedric Hawkins, Debbie Jones and Gary Williams
Case Number: 4:2024cv00134
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. (Dixon, Andrew)
March 25, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Party and for Leave to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Dixon, Andrew)
March 22, 2024 Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/21/2024; Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/4/2024; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/24/2025 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4D before Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/22/2024. (tmw)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time; and extending the time for Mr. Maxwell to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss to, and including, 3/25/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/13/2024. (jbh)
March 13, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Henry Maxwell, Jr (Dixon, Andrew)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER appointing attorney Andrew S. Dixon to represent Mr. Maxwell in all further proceedings in this action; and directing the Clerk of the Court to enter Mr. Dixon as attorney of record and send counsel a copy of this Order, a copy of Local Rule 83.7, and a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/8/2024. (jbh)
March 5, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Henry Maxwell, Jr. (jap)
March 1, 2024 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Brick, Phillip)
March 1, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Brick, Phillip)
March 1, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip M. Brick, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Brick, Phillip)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as premature #11 motion for hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/27/2024. (jbh)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing filed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Gary Williams served on 2/22/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Debbie Jones served on 2/22/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Cedric Hawkins served on 2/19/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Tammy Canada served on 2/19/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Brent Bridges served on 2/19/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Lindsey Phillips served on 2/19/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Lyndzey Hegwood served on 2/19/2024. (fjg)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. White Hall School District served on 2/22/2024. (fjg)
February 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William Cody Kees on behalf of All Defendants (Kees, William)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Henry Maxwell, Jr. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff. (Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT5319.) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. White Hall School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Maxwell, Jr
Represented By: Andrew S. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Hall School District
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndzey Hegwood
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Phillips
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Bridges
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Canada
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Hawkins
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Jones
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Williams
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Represented By: William Cody Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?