Galloway v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: James Galloway, IV
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv00136
Filed: February 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/24/2025 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 12/26/2024; Discovery due by 1/24/2025; Motions due by 2/24/2025; Status Report due by 2/24/2025; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/26/2025. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/3/2024. (hml)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (McCarroll, Mary)
March 21, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Answer and #6 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #3 was modified to include reference to the Jury demand as marked on the document. The docket text for docket entry #6 was modified to correct the attorney entering appearance as Kathy McCarroll as marked on the document. (jak)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/10/2024 and Jury Trial set for 6/10/2025 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #1D before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/20/2024. (hml)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathy McCarroll on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Tucker, Scott) (Docket text modified on 3/21/2024 to correct the attorney entering appearance) (jak)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott H. Tucker on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Tucker, Scott)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Tucker, Scott)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Tucker, Scott) (Docket text modified on 3/21/2024 to include reference to the Jury demand) (jak)
February 21, 2024 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company and returned to counsel for plaintiff. (jap)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
February 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by James Galloway, IV against Union Pacific Railroad Company. ( Fee $405, Receipt Number LIT5341.) No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Galloway, IV
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Represented By: Paul J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Mary Kathleen McCarroll
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?