Doe v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc and Rite of Passage
Case Number: 4:2024cv00149
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/6/2024. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2026 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #1A before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 3/13/2024. (slb)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony A. DiCarlo, III on behalf of Rite of Passage (DiCarlo, Tony)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rite of Passage.(DiCarlo, Tony)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.(ajj)
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (ajj)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John Doe. (ajj)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-24-85-3. Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT5375. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ajj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc
Represented By: James A. Wilson
Represented By: Zachary Richmond Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite of Passage
Represented By: Tony A. DiCarlo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?