Spaight v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Mark Spaight
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv00302
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/11/2024; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/24/2024; Jury Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 11/3/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/3/2024. (ljb)
May 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathleen McCarroll on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (McCarroll, Mary)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Tucker, Scott)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Tucker, Scott)
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Spaight. Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 4/18/2024. (Wolff, Nelson)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The civil cover sheet was not attached to the docket entry in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The civil cover sheet was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company filed by Mark Spaight. (Fee $405. Receipt Number LIT5921.) Summons issued and returned to counsel.(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2024: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spaight v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Spaight
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Mary Kathleen McCarroll
Represented By: Scott H. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?