Pitts v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Defendant: Dexter Payne and Arkansas, State of
Case Number: 4:2024cv00338
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 7/5/2024, an order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (fcd)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 second motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/6/2024. (cmn)
June 6, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (fcd)
May 28, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #12 Order of USCA. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #12 and hereto for service to the parties. (kbc)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (jbh)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 6/25/2024, an order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (jbh) Additional attachment added on 5/28/2024: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 USCA Docketing Letter as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. USCA Case Number 24-2086. (jbh)
May 28, 2024 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #6 Notice of Appeal re #4 Order, #5 Judgment. (jbh)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis and #8 motion for a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/28/2024. (jbh)
May 23, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (jbh)
May 23, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (jbh)
May 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order, #5 Judgment, by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (jbh)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #4 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/7/2024. (ljb)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 recommended disposition; denying #2 Pitts's petition for writ of habeas corpus; denying as moot #1 Pitts's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and dismissing this case without prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/7/2024. (ljb)
April 19, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Recommended Disposition. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate that #1 motion is denied as moot as marked on the Order. (jak)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied and dismissed without prejudice; recommending a certificate of appealability be denied; and denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/18/2024. (ldb) (Docket text modified on 4/19/2024 to indicate #1 motion is denied as moot)(jak)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ajj)
April 17, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Ray Pitts. (ajj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?