Smith v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Wade Smith
Defendant: North Little Rock Police Department and Whitley Jackson
Case Number: 4:2024cv00546
Filed: June 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2024 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Derrick Wade Smith re #9 Addendum, #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (fjg)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Pulaski County Detention Center; vacating the 7/8/2024 #5 Order and #6 Judgment; directing the Clerk of the Court to reopen the case; staying the case; and directing Plaintiff to either update the Court on the status of his pending state court case in six months or file a motion to lift stay if the case is resolved before then. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/24/2024. (jbh)
July 18, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Wade Smith. (llg)
July 18, 2024 Filing 9 ADDENDUM to #8 Amended Complaint filed by Derrick Wade Smith. (llg)
July 17, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Derrick Wade Smith. (ajj)
July 8, 2024 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ajj)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Consistent with today's #5 Order, this case is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/8/2024. (ajj) VACATED pursuant to #11 Order on 7/24/2024. (kbc)
July 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing this case, without prejudice; and denying #4 Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis as moot. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/8/2024. (ajj) VACATED pursuant to #11 Order on 7/24/2024. (kbc)
July 5, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Wade Smith. (llg)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a complete IFP motion within 30 days of the date of this order; and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an IFP application, including a prison calculation sheet, along with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/2024. (jbh)
June 26, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Derrick Wade Smith. (ldb)
June 26, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Wade Smith. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitley Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Wade Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?