Roberts v. Norris
Case Number: 5:2004cv00004
Filed: January 6, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER directing Petitioner to file an amended petition and a supporting brief no later than 90 days from the date of this order. Respondent shall file an answer and responsive brief no later than 60 days from Petitioner's filing of his amended petition and supporting brief. Petitioner shall file a reply brief no later than 30 days from Respondent's answer and brief. Petitioner's monthly status reports are no longer required. Signed by Judge Richard G. Kopf on 6/10/2020. (jak)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 240 Motion to File Part of the State Court Record under seal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Kopf on 6/1/2020. (jak)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 235 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time. The state-court record shall be filed on or before 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Richard G. Kopf on 4/16/2020. (jak)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Mr. Hylden's involvement in this case, and delete him from any future PACER/ECF notifications herein. Signed by Judge Richard G. Kopf on 10/7/2019. (jak)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 222 Motion. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Mr. Eddy, Ms. Horan, and Ms. Brain's involvement in this case, and delete them from any future PACER/ECF notifications herein. Signed by Judge Richard G. Kopf on 8/5/2019. (jak)(Docket text modified on 8/5/2019 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Court's 56 "Stay and Abey" Order will remain in full force and effect; the Court's 57 Order regarding the filing of Status Reports will also remain in full force and effect, except the reports will be filed on the first business day of each month, beginning 1/3/12, rather than every 30 days. Signed by Judge Richard G. Kopf on 12/12/11. (vjt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?