Williams v. Norris, et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00048
Filed: February 16, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 366 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 365 Order entered this day, Judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiff and against Defendants Harmon, James, Evans, Harris and Moncrief in the amount of $36. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/28/2013. (dmn)
November 19, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the deposition of defendant Tim Moncrief be taken by telephone, at the Varner Unit, in plaintiff's presence, within the next forty-five days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
November 12, 2009 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 305 Motion to Quash the deposition of Tim Moncrief; and directing the parties to confer concerning the re-scheduling of the deposition and to notify the Court of such within five days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/12/09. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 290 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Williams 296 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/09. (bkp)
May 13, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to issue a check to On the Record Recording and Transcription Service in the amount of $148.80 for the transcript submitted on April 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/13/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 5/14/2009 to correct the amount due.) (thd)
May 5, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's counsel oral motion to extend time in which to respond to 296 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS until May 23, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/5/09. (bkp)
April 29, 2009 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Michael Moore to represent plaintiff and directing the Clerk to send counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/29/09. (bkp)
April 14, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 285 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 281 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Williams. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/14/09. (bkp)
January 6, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 257 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 251 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Norris, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?