Cantrell v. Huckabee, et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00157
Filed: May 23, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Grant Harris, Larry May, Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Tim Moncrief against Jimmy Shane Cantrell re 169 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/10. (bkp)
June 21, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff and his witnesses (Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Grant Harris, Larry May and Tim Moncrief) at the trial of this matter on Monday, July 19, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. and each day thereafter until the trial is concluded; and further, to send with the plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/21/10. (bkp)
June 9, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration re 144 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to plaintiff at EARU POB #180, Brickeys, AR 72320. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/9/10. (bkp)
March 22, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of the defts Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, Grant Harris, Larry May and Tim Moncrief and the plaintiff Jimmy Shane Cantrell at the trial of this matter on Monday, April 5, 2010, at 8:30 a.m. and each day thereafter until the trial is concluded and to send with the plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/22/10. (bkp)
June 11, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 129 Motion for Reconsideration of motion to withdraw as counsel and dismissing Jeff Rosenzweig as attorney for plaintiff and appointing Frederick S. Wetzell III to represent plaintiff: Clerk is directed to send both plaintiff and Mr. Wetzell a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/11/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Huckabee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?