Cantrell v. Reed, et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00169
Filed: June 6, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 210 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/26/11. (vjt)
June 14, 2011 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court will accept Cantrell's 197 Objections to the magistrate judge's Orders 186 190 as filed on 6/5/11; however, they were due on 5/31/11, and are therefore denied as untimely. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/11. (vjt)
April 13, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send pltf a copy of 173 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel and 174 Brief in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/13/11. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING 173 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel and 175 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion to Magistrate Judge H. David Young for disposition. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/12/11. (vjt)
March 17, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 166 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions; Dispositive motions due by 3/28/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/17/11. (vjt)
January 23, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward documents received by the Court from Plaintiff to counsel for Plaintiff without filing them; the Clerk is further directed to forward a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his new address. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/23/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Reed, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?