Langford et al v. Ifedoria et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00216
Filed: July 21, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 234 Magistrate Judge Jerome T Kearney's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; granting 229 defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings; and dismissing all John and Jane Doe defendants without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/21/11. (hph)
September 20, 2011 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 225 Magistrate Judge Jerome T Kearney's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; granting in part 192 Correctional Medical Service, Inc's motion for partial summary judgment, with respect to plaintiffs' claims against them based on the Americans with Disabilities Act and Rehabilitation Act; and denying 192 with respect to the remaining claims against them. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/20/11. (hph)
September 12, 2011 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 235 Motion to Substitute Party. Dale Langford added. Mack Langford terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/12/11. (kpr)
June 15, 2011 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 224 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/15/11. (kpr)
April 19, 2011 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 203 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs are directed to respond to defts' arguments within 20 days of the date of this Order. Defts may file a reply within five days of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/19/11. (kpr)
December 1, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 185 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/1/10. (bkp)
October 28, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 182 USCA Mandate granting summary judgment in favor of defts Norris, Byus and Mobley on plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/10. (bkp)
April 6, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 151 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 123 Motion to Sever; granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/6/09. (mkf)
February 5, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Extend Time and directing that the case-in-chief disclosures shall be filed on or before March 13, 2009; granting 113 Motion to Substitute Party and substituting Marvin Evans and dismissing Rick Toney as a party deft.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/5/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford et al v. Ifedoria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?