Kain v. Norris

Case Number: 5:2006cv00046
Filed: February 24, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT purs to Order 14 entered this date, this petition is hereby dismissed pending an order from the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals containing authorization for filing . Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/26/06. (vjt)
May 10, 2006 12 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 be dismissed pending an order from the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals containing authorization for filing; Objections to R&R due by 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge Henry L. Jones Jr. on 5/10/06. (vjt)
May 5, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Henry L. Jones Jr. on 5/5/06. (mkf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kain v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?