Palton v. Jackson

Case Number: 5:2006cv00198
Filed: July 26, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's pro se 251 Application for Writ of Execution; pltf is represented by counsel and may file pleadings through him. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/14/11. (vjt)
August 28, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 228 Motion for Judgment NOV, or, in the alternative, partial motion for new trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/28/09. (mkf)
July 17, 2009 224 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jason Deon Palton against Antonio Remley in the amount of $250,000; in favor of Jason Deon Palton against Hurst in the amount of $1,000, as well as compensatory damages of $10,000 re 223 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/17/09. (bkp)
May 29, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 183 Motion to Seal Exhibit D to 181 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/29/09. (bkp)
April 9, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 157 Motion to Quash; granting 159 Motion to Quash; granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extending discovery ddl until May 8, 2009 and the motions ddl to May 22, 2009; granting 171 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palton v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?