McClellan v. Norris

Case Number: 5:2006cv00329
Filed: December 26, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/17/09. (dac)
July 27, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 35 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, judgment will be entered dismissing the 2 petition for writ of habeas corpus with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/27/09. (vjt)
July 9, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James S McClellan. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?