Burris v. Lincoln County Quorum Court et al

Plaintiff: Billy Burris
Defendant: Benjamin Reeves, Lincoln County Quorum Court, Larry McGee, Jason Case and Kevin Goforth
Case Number: 5:2007cv00087
Filed: April 24, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case with prejudice due to settlement. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/27/09. (bkp)
November 4, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed defts 26 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/4/08. (bkp)
September 29, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Reconsideration and vacating 17 Order and 18 Judgment; and directing pltf to submit his response to the motion for summary judgment on or before October 6, 2008, as well as a response to defts' statement of facts, defts will submit a reply brief on or before October 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/29/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. Lincoln County Quorum Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County Quorum Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Burris
Represented By: John L. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?