Staples v. Batesville Casket Company Inc

Plaintiff: Vertie Staples
Defendant: Batesville Casket Company Inc
Case Number: 5:2007cv00214
Filed: August 17, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss and dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/09. (bkp)
August 10, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 129 Motion to Certify Class; denying 144 Motion to Strike ; denying 153 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/10/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Motion to Seal Exhibit 1 filed in support of Motion for Class Certification 130 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/4/09. (bkp)
January 13, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 106 plaintiff's revised Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/13/09. (bkp)
October 28, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 106 Amended MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Garry Clayton directing plaintiff to prepare a supplemental brief identifying those requests limited to discovery necessary for determination of class; deft should file a response to plaintiff's supplemental brief within 15 days of receipt. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/28/08. (bkp)
September 11, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/11/08. (jct)
February 7, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential discovery information. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/7/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staples v. Batesville Casket Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertie Staples
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batesville Casket Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?