Luce et al v. Bobby Wilkerson Inc

Plaintiff: Andrea Luce and Hot Rocks Inc
Defendant: Bobby Wilkerson Inc
Case Number: 5:2007cv00241
Filed: September 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon plaintiffs' oral motion to voluntarily dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/30/09. (bkp)
December 2, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Reconsideration re 18 MOTION to Continue filed by Andrea Luce and continuing the trial until June 22, 2009 and extending all previously scheduled ddls for 60 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/08. (bkp)
November 25, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luce et al v. Bobby Wilkerson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Luce
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hot Rocks Inc
Represented By: Denise Reid Hoggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Wilkerson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?