Sanders v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lee Sanders
Defendant: Larry Norris, June Daniels, Reckor and John Banks
Case Number: 5:2007cv00262
Filed: October 12, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 216 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Dr. Guise's Motion for Summary Judgment 202 and Pltf's motion for voluntary dismissal of Dr. Guise are GRANTED; Pltf's remaining claims against Dr. Edwards are DISMISSED and the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/12/10. (vjt)
January 25, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendant Guise's 202 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal of Dr. Guise be GRANTED; that the Court finds there are no genuine issues of material fact remaining and Dr. Edwards is entitled to dismissal of all the claims against him; and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections must be received no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/25/2010. (jas)
January 15, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendant Doctor Ben Guise and the U.S. Marshal to serve this Defendant with a copy of the Complaint (DE#2), the Court's October 22, 2008 Order (DE#142), the Recommendations it adopted (DE#139), this Order, and summons, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/15/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reckor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?