Duren v. Washington Group International Inc

Plaintiff: Dexter Duren
Defendant: Washington Group International Inc
Case Number: 5:2007cv00297
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dexter Duren against Washington Group International Inc in the amount of $40,945.34 plus pre-judgment interest of.49% ($1.08 per day) since April 23, 2007 47 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)
May 1, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/1/09. (bkp)
April 30, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing counsel to bring electronic equipment into the Courthouse May 4-6, 2009. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/30/09. (bkp)
January 9, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duren v. Washington Group International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Duren
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Group International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?