Stanley v. Tyson Foods Inc

Plaintiff: Deborah Stanley
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc
Case Number: 5:2008cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement between the parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/10/09. (bkp)
March 2, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Alter Judgment, Request for Hearing and Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/2/09. (bkp)
December 22, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Defendant's Motion to Strike plaintiff's expert witness report. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/22/2008. (thd)
November 5, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Compel; granting 40 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 56 Motion to Extend Time; and directing plaintiff to disclose to deft the name of her expert witnesses and submit their signed reports and to file her motion for class certification within fourteen days of this order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/08. (bkp)
November 3, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's motion to extend agreed protective order 36 ; finding as moot motion to place confidential documents produced by Morgan Welch under protective order 50 ; and denying plaintiff's renewed motion to compel 44 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/08. (bkp) (docket text modified on 11/4/2008 to correct spelling error) (bfw). (docket text modified on 11/5/2008 to indicate document 40 inadvertently referenced in Order, ruling is for document 50 instead) (bfw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Tyson Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Stanley
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?