Pennington v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Pennington, Jr
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Arnold, John Doe, Grant Harris and John Byus
Case Number: 5:2008cv00018
Filed: January 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 177 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, pltf's motions for summary judgment 84 105 are DENIED; defts' motions for summary judgment 130 169 are GRANTED, and pltf's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; all remaining motions are denied as moot 134 143 152 158 160 161 162 163 167 173 182 ; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/16/09. (vjt)
August 25, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 84 , 105 Platiniff's motions for summary judgment be denied; recommending that 130 , 169 Defendants' cross motions for summary judgment be granted and Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice; and recommending all remaining motions be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/25/09. (hph)
June 22, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 150 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying Motions to Amend/Correct filed by Frederick Pennington, Jr. 129 144 133 108 . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/22/09. (bkp)
May 21, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 117 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 78 83 Motions to Amend/Correct filed by Frederick Pennington, Jr. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/21/09. (bkp)
May 11, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 119 Partial Report and Recommendations denying 98 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Frederick Pennington, Jr. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/11/09. (bkp)
April 24, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 92 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the John Doe defendant without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/24/09. (bkp)
September 24, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/24/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Pennington, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Byus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?