Cash v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Mark A Cash
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 5:2008cv00060
Filed: March 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Federal Employer's Liability Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/17/10. (bkp)
March 15, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re railroad retirement taxes and directing parties to submit explanations and calculations by 4 p.m., Monday, March 22, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/15/10. (bkp)
March 1, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on 37 39 MOTIONS in Limine filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company and Mark Cash and denying plaintiff's pending "Supplemental Motion" (Doc. No. 69) as moot. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/1/10. (bkp)
February 25, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel regarding precedent for an order based on the Court's rulings on the Motions in Limine during a telephone conference. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/25/10. (bkp)
February 19, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part deft's Motion in Limine Number 8; granting in part and denying in part Motion in Limine No. 11 and holding in abeyance in part; holding in abeyance pltf's Motion in Limine No. 3 37 39 . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/19/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion in Limine, directing the parties to brief the issue held in abeyance in nu mber 11 by 5 p.m., Wednesday, January 27, 2010 ; re-opening discovery issue with the discovery cut-off for the issue in number 12 being 5 p.m., March 22, 2010, with telephone conferences to be scheduled on several other issues. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/20/10. (bkp)
November 12, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/12/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Cash
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?