Gray v. Clark County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Ruffus Gray
Defendant: Clark County Jail, Diagnostic Center, Correctional Medical Services and York
Case Number: 5:2008cv00128
Filed: May 5, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 117 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/10. (vjt)
April 23, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to deft Moskovich's 96 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/10. (bkp)
November 9, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 83 granting 74 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing deft Newburn from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/9/09. (bkp)
October 14, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending deft Jackie Newburn's motion for summary judgment be granted 74 ; Objections to R&R due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/14/09. (tjj)
July 8, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Heartsill Ragon, III to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action; and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/8/09. (bkp)
May 6, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; Adopting 60 Partial Report and Recommendations; pltf's allegations against defendants Kittrell and Blackmon are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/6/09. (mkf)
March 5, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 56 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ravi Mehta and dismissing deft Mehta from the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/5/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Clark County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruffus Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diagnostic Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?