Harris v. Norris

Plaintiff: Gregory Harris
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00158
Filed: May 29, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the motion for reconsideration 24 of the Report and Recommendations filed by Gregory Harris and again adopting the proposed findings and recommended disposition submitted by Magistrate Judge Jones. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/3/08. (bkp)
September 25, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Gregory Harris re 21 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/25/08. (bkp)
September 10, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the petition be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/10/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?