Boyd et al v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Tim Boyd and Rhonda Boyd
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2008cv00166
Filed: June 4, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/17/09. (bkp)
June 18, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/18/09. (bkp)
June 9, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 17 MOTION in Limine Excluding Evidence of Other Fires in the McGehee Area; counsel may provide the Court with a letter brief by noon, Tuesday, June 16, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/9/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd et al v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Boyd
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Boyd
Represented By: Stephen L. Gershner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?