Wells et al v. Jordan et al

Plaintiff: James A Wells and Veronica Wells
Defendant: Roy Lee Jordan, 3J Trucking Inc, H & P Leasing, Inc and John Does
Case Number: 5:2008cv00177
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Drew
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Non-Suit Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/10. (vjt)
December 23, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting aside 10 Default Judgment entered against H & P Leasing, Inc. on 11/12/08 based upon Plaintiffs' failure to properly effect service of process on said defendant, per H & P Leasing, Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Default Judgments filed in lead Case No. 5:08CV00163. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/23/08. (jct)
November 12, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of James A Wells, Veronica Wells against H & P Leasing Inc. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/08. (bkp) Modified on 12/23/2008 to reflect Default Judgment set aside pursuant to 12 Order (jct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells et al v. Jordan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Wells
Represented By: Bill D. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Wells
Represented By: Bill D. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Lee Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3J Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & P Leasing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?