Holloway v. Sweet et al

Plaintiff: Winston Holloway
Defendant: Aneda Sweet, Stacy Boardman and Marie Boardman
Case Number: 5:2008cv00196
Filed: July 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 157 Order Dismissing Case with prejudice and dismissing the defts with prejudice as parties to this action. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/7/11. (bkp)
October 27, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/27/10. (bkp)
August 20, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 134 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/20/10. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Dept. of Correction to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff, Winston Holloway, ADC #67507, his medical file and his institutional file at the evidentiary hearing on Tuesday, June 29, 2010, by 9:00 a.m.; and directing the parties to meet with the Court's courtroom deputy at 9:00 a.m. the morning of the hearing with their witness and exhibit lists. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/15/10. (bkp)
December 2, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 119 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and appointing Richard N. Watts as counsel for plaintiff; setting a second evidentiary hearing on Tuesday, June 29, 2010, at 9:30 a.m., Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, AR; and directing the Clerk to send counsel a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/2/09. (bkp)
November 12, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice for failure to introduce sufficient evidence to create a fact issue to be submitted to a jury 2 5 74 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due no later than eleven days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/12/2009. (lej)
September 22, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 109 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendant Brian D. Shelton without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/22/09. (bkp)
August 25, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/25/09. (bkp)
September 30, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft Marie Boardman; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for each of the other defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the original and amended complaints with any attachments by serving the Humphries and Lewis Law Firm. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/30/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Sweet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aneda Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?