Plunk v. Norris

Plaintiff: Terry Gale Plunk
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00203
Filed: July 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 186 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 185 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/9/12. (vjt)
June 9, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the scheduled hearing will remain set for 7/12/11; however, if it is necessary for Petitioner's counsel to be involved with the death penalty case on that date, the hearing will commence at 9:30 a.m. on 7/13/11; counsel must notify the Court as soon as they know whether or not our case must be delayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/9/11. (vjt)
June 6, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file, on or before 6/17/11, any amendments to their pre-hearing briefs in light of the disclosure of Dr. Roger Moore's report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/6/11. (vjt)
April 7, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's requests for a protective order limiting Dr. Moore's examination or permitting the presence of Petitioner's counsel, as set forth in document 150 , are both denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/7/11. (vjt)
March 15, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 132 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Respondent's 61 Motion for Summary Judgment and Petitioner's 92 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment are hereby DENIED and this case shall proceed to an evidentiary hearing on the issues set forth in the recommendations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/15/11. (vjt)
November 16, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Deborah Devries' Motion to Compel; 88 Petitioner's Motion for Protective Order is denied without prejudice; 90 Respondent's Motion to Preclude Petitioner from using any report and or testimony of Dr. Dale Watson at any evidentiary hearing in this matter is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/16/10. (vjt)
October 18, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Exhibit O to his 115 Response filed on September 10, 2010 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/18/10. (vjt)
October 5, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner's 122 Motion in Limine is DENIED without prejudice to later objections to specific deposition testimony; petitioner's 123 Motion to Expedite is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/5/10. (vjt)
September 14, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 118 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit F Under Seal; the Clerk is directed to place Respondent's Exhibit F to 115 Response under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 9/14/10. (vjt)
August 17, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Respondent's 108 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal three attachments to his 107 Reply; Respondent is directed to submit these attachments and the Clerk shall file under seal Attachments B, C and I to docket entry 107 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 8/17/10. (vjt)
July 29, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion to Stay to the extent that times for responses/replies will be extended and will be re-set when the Court rules on the motion for leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/29/10. (bkp)
June 30, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 79 Respondent's Partial Motion to Quash Subpoenas of non-parties Chris Carter and Wes Bradford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/30/10. (vjt)
May 21, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's deadline for responding to Respondent's 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment is suspended and will be reset once the pending issues have been resolved regarding the motions for discovery and to hold the summary judgment motion in abeyance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 5/21/10. (vjt)
April 21, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to docket the transcript of the July 27, 2007 proceedings in Boone County Circuit Court Case No. CR 2007-193(Devries). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/21/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plunk v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Gale Plunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?