Winston v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Eric Winston
Defendant: Fred Evans and Veronica Tinsley
Case Number: 5:2008cv00204
Filed: July 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/25/11. (bkp)
December 23, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 101 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; Defendant Veronica Tinsley's oral motion to dismiss is DENIED, and Plaintiff is allowed to proceed to jury trial on his claims against Tinsley. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/23/09. (mkf)
March 23, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 66 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/23/09. (bkp)
January 20, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 44 Motion for Default Judgment and 47 Motion for Writ of Execution; Motions are DENIED as moot and premature, respectively. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/20/09. (mkf)
January 13, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 42 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing without prejudice the claims against deft Fred Evans, and certifying that an ifp appeal taken from this order is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/13/09. (bkp)
December 29, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Default Judgment and 27 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Eric Winston and directing the Clerk of the Court to enter deft Tinsley's default and directing deft Tinsley to respond, no later than 15 days after the entry of this Order, to plaintiff's request for the entry of a default judgment against her; and further directing the Clerk of the Court to forward a copy of this Order to deft Tinsley at the address indicated on the Marshal's return of service. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/29/08. (bkp)
October 22, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to submit, no later than 30 days after the entry of this order, an address at which Fred Evans, Jr. may be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/22/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Tinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?