Winston v. Gonda et al

Plaintiff: Eric Winston
Defendant: Marshal Gonda and Micheal Hutchinson
Case Number: 5:2008cv00230
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing the case with prejudice pursuant to the 94 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/19/11. (kpr)
November 18, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's Motion for Settlement Conference in case 5:08CV00204 (docket entry #127); the Clerk is directed to randomly assign a different Magistrate Judge to conduct a settlement conference for all three cases, 5:08CV00204, 5:08CV00230, and 5:08CV231. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/18/10. (vjt)
June 1, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 71 Partial Report and Recommendations and allowing plaintiff to proceed to a jury trial only on his claims of excessive force, failure to protect, and delay of medical card and dismissing all other claims with prejudice; and denying as moot 68 Motion to Compel filed by Eric Winston,. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/09. (bkp)
November 3, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to take the neccesary steps to show referral of the present case to Magistrate Judge H. David Young, and to make the necessary chip exchange. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/08. (bkp)
October 28, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the case back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Gonda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshal Gonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?