Gray v. Ford et al

Plaintiff: Terry D Gray
Defendant: Donny Ford, Dallas County Detention Facility and John Does
Case Number: 5:2008cv00234
Filed: August 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to Order dismissing this case without prejudice; certifying that an ifp appeal taken from the order and this judgment is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/6/09. (bkp)
September 17, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's 3 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and for failure to respond to the Court's Order; the Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith; Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/17/09. (vjt)
September 1, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against the deft John Doe officers without prejudice and certifying that an ifp appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/1/09. (bkp)
January 26, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 19 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; Pltf's claims against the Dallas County Detention Facility are DISMISSED with prejudice, and its name is removed as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?