Robinson v. Arkansas Convalescent Center

Plaintiff: Eddie Lee Robinson
Defendant: Arkansas Convalescent Center
Case Number: 5:2008cv00241
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 23 Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/23/08. (jct)
October 21, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss and directing the plaintiff to submit by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, November 10, 2008, an amended complaint and a copy of the EEOC Charge of Discrimination plaintiff filed. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/21/08. (bkp)
September 2, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Service on Defendant pursuant to 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/2/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Arkansas Convalescent Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Lee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Convalescent Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?