Dunmore v. Cole et al

Plaintiff: Edward Charles Dunmore
Defendant: Brent Cole and Gentry DePriest
Case Number: 5:2008cv00255
Filed: September 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Grant
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Brent Cole, Gentry DePriest against Edward Charles Dunmore re 136 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing all of plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/19/10. (bkp)
December 17, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the Court adopt this Proposed Decision and that Judgment be entered in favor of Defendants. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/17/09. (hph)
September 14, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reminding Plaintiff to timely and properly file his Statement of Disputed Facts in compliance with 88 Order or otherwise, all of the facts set forth in Defendant's summary judgment papers could be deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/14/09. (mkf)
June 1, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 62 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing the John Doe defendants and plaintiff's inadequate medical care claims; and certifying that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/09. (bkp)
March 3, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss filed by defts Gentry DePriest, Brent Cole: Plaintiff's official capacity claims against defts Cole and DePriest are dismissed , without prejudice, and Plaintiff shall proceed with his individual capacity claims against those two defts; defts shall file an answer within ten days of the entry of this Order; and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith; d irecting the Clerk to amend the docket sheet as set forth in this Order; to add John Doe defts; and pltf to file within 60 days of this Order, a motion for service containing John Doe defts' names and addresses. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/3/09. (bkp)
November 3, 2008 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Smith and the Grant County Sheriff's Department without prejudice; directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts DePriest and Cole and the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the original and amended complaints with any attachments, a copy of the docket sheet and summons without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunmore v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Charles Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry DePriest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?