McEwing v. Norris

Plaintiff: Andre Deon McEwing
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00268
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying [] Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/31/09. (mkf)
July 27, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 10 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, judgment will be entered dismissing this habeas petition with prejudice as untimely; all pending motions are denied 7 . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/27/09. (vjt)
July 9, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing 1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andre Deon McEwing. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEwing v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Deon McEwing
Represented By: John L. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?