Hooten v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Edward Joe Hooten
Defendant: Jonnie R Harris, Lillie Phillips Ward, Jesse M Davis and Mark Cashion
Case Number: 5:2008cv00274
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Lillie Phillips Ward against Edward Joe Hooten re 29 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint with prejudice and denying relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/4/09. (bkp)
April 15, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defts' motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice 17 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 4/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/15/2009. (lej)
November 4, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Harris, Davis and Cashion; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for deft Ward and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint with attachments, a copy of the recommendations, and a summons upon deft through the Compliance Division of the ADC without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/4/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooten v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Joe Hooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonnie R Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillie Phillips Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?