Freeman v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Floyd L Freeman
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc, Larry B Norris, John Byus, Rick Toney and Does
Case Number: 5:2008cv00277
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 93 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Correctional Medical Services Inc, dismissing the complaint of Floyd L Freeman with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/10. (vjt)
July 12, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Correctional Medical Services Inc within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/12/10. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deft Antosh is GRANTED; Antosh terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/15/10. (vjt)
May 12, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER direccting the plaintiff to file a response to defts' 67 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Substitute Party within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/12/10. (bkp)
April 21, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 64 Response to the Magistrate Judge's Partial Report and Recommendation 62 , shall be filed as pltf's timely answers to Interrogatories 4 and 5 as ordered by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/21/10. (vjt)
April 14, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 62 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 56 Third Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; defts' 60 Motion to Compel is GRANTED, and pltf is directed to answer Interrogatories 4 and 5 within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/14/10. (vjt)
February 22, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to defts' 56 Third MOTION to Dismiss within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd L Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry B Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Byus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?