Thomas v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Phillip A Thomas
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 5:2008cv00287
Filed: October 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Federal Employer's Liability Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/26/10. (bkp)
January 12, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/12/10. (bkp)
December 10, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company to counsel directing that they respond to the motion by 12:00 noon on Thursday, December 17, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/10/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A Thomas
Represented By: John G. Zgourides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?